GA SB389 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the Municipal Court of Columbus, Georgia, approved August 12, 1915 (Ga. L. 1915, p. 63), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 21, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 4271), so as to change fees and costs and the provisions relating thereto; to impose a technology fee for the service of dispossessory warrants; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Municipal Court of Columbus, Georgia; change fees and costs; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #613 (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |