GA SB392 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 362
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 362
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Doerun; to provide for incorporation boundaries, powers and construction; to provide for a governing authority and its membership, elections, and terms; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Doerun; new charter; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 362 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |