GA SB420 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, so as to require referendum approval prior to the expenditure of public funds for the establishment of a fixed guideway transit; to provide for definitions; to provide for submission of the question to qualified voters; to provide for ballot language; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local Government; require referendum approval prior to the expenditure of public funds; establishment of a fixed guideway transit
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #795 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #788 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #551 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #788 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #551 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 624 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |