GA SB426 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Sugar Hill, approved May 14, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3546), so as to change provisions relating to municipal property ownership; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sugar Hill, City of; municipal property ownership; change provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #586 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |