GA SB442 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property, so as to prohibit amendments to property owners' association instruments and covenants that restrict rental of residential lots and plots; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; amendments to property owners' association instruments and covenants that restrict rental of residential lots and plots; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #693 (Y: 123 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 573
2020-08-05SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-24SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-22HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-20HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-19HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-10HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-09SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback