GA SB444 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to services for the aging, so as to create the Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementias State Plan Advisory Council; to provide for legislative declaration; to provide for definitions; to provide for membership; to provide for duties and reporting requirements; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementias State Plan Advisory Council; create
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #716 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 469 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |