GA SB453 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to transfer probation and intake services of the Juvenile Court of Gordon County to the Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice pursuant to Code Section 15-11-69 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Court of Gordon County; transfer probation and intake services to the Georgia Department of Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #521 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #491 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #491 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |