GA SB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a new Board of Commissioners of Henry County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3680), as amended, particularly by an Act approved September 21, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011 Ex. Sess., p. 486), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Henry County; description of the commissioner districts; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Local Calendar Immediately Transmit: House Vote #533 (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 14 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #532 (Y: 131 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #532 (Y: 131 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 537 | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-17 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |