GA SB484 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the state's Employee Benefit Plan Council, so as to require such council to establish health savings accounts and to continually provide for education or salary reductions for such accounts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State's Employee Benefit Plan Council; establish health savings accounts and continually provide for education or salary reductions for such accounts; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66893 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223580 |