GA SB508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Rockdale County, approved April 2, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5452), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 18, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3837), so as to provide an additional judge for such court; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge of such court; to provide for the election of successors; to revise inaccurate references; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of Rockdale County; additional judge for such court; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #763 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 397 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |