GA SB543 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 2 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bingo, so as to change certain provisions relating to bingo games operated by nonprofit, tax-exempt organizations; to remove certain limitations regarding premises on which such bingo games may be held; to change certain provisions relating to the prizes and proceeds of such bingo games; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bingo; certain provisions relating to bingo games operated by nonprofit, tax-exempt organizations; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #595 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | House Postponed |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |