GA SB61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 4 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to self-service storage facilities, so as to change the short title; to provide for definitions; to change the due date for monthly rental payments; to provide procedures for sending notice of default; to provide for print or electronic publication of notice of public sale of property; to provide for limitations on an owner's liability; to provide for towing of motor vehicles and watercraft; to provide for delay in filing an owner's lien if an occupant is deployed overseas by the armed services; to exempt certain rental agreements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Self-service Storage Facility Act of 2013" change the due date for monthly rental payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #397 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 172 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |