GA SB616 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the State Court of Chattooga County, approved March 29, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 4570), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 16, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4710), so as to change the compensation of the solicitor-general of the State Court of Chattooga County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of Chattooga County; compensation of the solicitor-general; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #685 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #685 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Veto V3 | |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |