GA SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 10 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to capital outlay funds for elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for eligibility for regular funding, advance funding, and low-wealth capital outlay funding for educational facilities that are extensively destroyed or damaged by a fire or natural disaster to concurrently repair, update, or replace the portion of any such facility that was not destroyed or damaged; to provide an additional path for eligibility for local school systems for low-wealth capital outlay funding; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Capital Outlay Funds; eligibility for regular funding, advance funding for educational facilities; destroyed by fire or natural disaster; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #242 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #49 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #49 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-10 | Act 318 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |