GA SB79 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to victim compensation, so as to expand the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council's powers and duties relative to claims for victim compensation; to increase the amount payable for funeral expenses; to enlarge the pool of claimants to include individuals related by marriage; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Victim Compensation; expand the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council's powers and duties relative to claims
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #339 (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #36 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #36 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 169 | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |