GA SB84 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to revise provisions relating to eligibility for election as a local board of education member; to provide for legislative findings; to limit the size of local boards of education; to revise provisions relating to per diem and expenses of local board of education members; to revise certain provisions relating to the secretary of local boards of education; to provide for the fundamental roles of local boards of education and local school superintendents; to prohibit certain conflicts of interest of board members; to provide for a code of ethics for local board of education members; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local Boards of Education; election; revise provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Eric Johnson [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Dan Weber [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #807 - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment To House Substitute (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #706 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #77 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By Senator From The 44th To Committee Sub (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #76 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 44th To Committee Sub (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #706 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #77 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By Senator From The 44th To Committee Sub (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #76 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 44th To Committee Sub (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-25 | Act 463 | |
2010-05-25 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-03 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-26 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-02 | Senate Read and Referred |