GA SB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-250.3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to educational institutions exempted from application of part relative to nonpublic postsecondary educational institutions, so as to provide for an exemption for dental schools meeting certain criteria; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nonpublic Postsecondary Educational Institutions; exemption for dental schools meeting certain criteria; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #351 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #291 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #72 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #291 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #72 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 226 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |