GA SR1099 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Alcoholic Beverage Retail Licensing and "Tied House" Laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Retail Licensing and "Tied House" Laws; create senate study committee
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/41950 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/141890 |