GA SR19 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on Advance Directives; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on Advance Directives; create
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Read and Referred |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/32095 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/sr19_As_introduced_LC_28_5395_2.htm |