GA SR579 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to authorize the Georgia General Assembly to provide by general law for sports betting in this state; to provide for the regulation and allocation of revenues of such activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Sports Betting; Georgia General Assembly to provide by general law for sports betting in this state; authorize -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Carden Summers [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment: Senate Vote #577 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |