GA SR76 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging any organization that administers or conducts high-risk athletic activities for children 14 and under on property owned, leased, managed, or maintained by the state of Georgia to make accessible to athletic directors and coaches a training program covering important safety information for prevention and treatment of injuries to our young athletes; and for other purposes.
Title
Training Program; high-risk athletic activities for children 14 and under on property owned by the state of Georgia; covering important safety information for prevention and treatment of injuries to our young athletes; encourage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #79 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |