GA SR765 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the change of use of certain properties located in Bryan and Butts counties currently dedicated as a heritage preserve; authorizing the granting of nonexclusive easements for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, and ingress and egress in, on, over, upon, across, or through certain state owned real property located in Bryan, Butts, and Liberty counties; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property Conveyance; grant nonexclusive easement to Bryan, Butts, and Liberty counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #705 - Adopt (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #517 - Adoption (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #517 - Adoption (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-07 | Act 770 | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-19 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |