GA SR810 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging school districts to establish and maintain recycling programs; and for other purposes.
Title
School Districts; establish and maintain recycling programs; urge
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57690 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190796 |