GA SR859 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Minerals Management Service of the United States Department of the Interior to include all outer continental shelf planning areas in its proposed five-year plan for 2010 through 2015 and to approve the broadest possible five-year plan for offshore development; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Dept. of Interior, Mineral Mgmt. Service; urged to include all outer continental shelf planning areas in proposed five-year plan
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 - Consent Calendar Expressing The Will Of The Senate (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |