GA SR973 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Child Protection Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Child Protection Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Vincent Fort [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #758 (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |