HI HB1070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HRE/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HRE/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii Board of Regents to complete annual training on board policies and procedures, Hawaii's Sunshine Law, and Hawaii's open records law. Requires the removal of a regent who fails to meet specified conditions. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1070 HD2)
Title
University of Hawaii Board of Regents; Training
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE/JDL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1385 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.