HI HB1070 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1070
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a framework that supports consistent land use planning and development across the University of Hawaii system through designation of university districts and allows project partnerships with qualified persons. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To University Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 165) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HET, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1070 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1224 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SB1224 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.