HI HB1076 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 120, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 120, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Statutorily authorizes the 2009 special administrative transfer for payment of unemployment insurance program administrative expenses. (SD2)
Title
Employment Security
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 120, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 120, on 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 703). | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, Nishimoto, Pine excused (4). | |
2011-05-05 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 698). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-05-02 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Rhoads, McKelvey, Yamashita (Co-)Chairman; Hashem, Johanson. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, McKelvey, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Hashem, Johanson. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-22-11 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 250). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.