HI HB1076 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1076
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products. Appropriates funds. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to the sale of tobacco products. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-02 | House | Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT/JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1374 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1076 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
HB1076 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1076&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1076_.HTM |