HI HB1109 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employee with a family member in the United States armed forces who is on active duty or notified of a call to active duty, to use family leave for certain activities for which an employee may take military family leave under federal law. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)
Title
Family Leave; Military Deployment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 271). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from PBM/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM/LAB on Friday, 02-11-11 11:15AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBM/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB889 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (S) Referred to PGM, JDL.