HI HB1111 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 073, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 073, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation (HHSC) to set rates for certain copies of records protected from the disclosure requirements of Chapter 92F, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Establishes minimum and maximum rates for copies of medical records subpoenaed from any of HHSC's regional system facilities, and requires the amount to be based on the actual cost of preparation. (HB1111 CD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation; Copies of Records; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Act 073, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2016-06-21 | House | Act 073, on 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1174). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Cullen, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Chun Oakland Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2016-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3347) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3013) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 182). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 490-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-02-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-06-15 8:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |