HI HB1146 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a carbon emissions tax credit. Expands the environmental response, energy, and food security tax to include carbon emissions. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023. Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development, in consultation with the Department of Taxation, to recommend updates to the tax per fuel and corresponding tax credits. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1146 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
SB1004 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
SB1004 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Environmental Response, Energy, Carbon Emissions, and Food Security Tax
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Tax Credit
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Tax Credit