HI HB1165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 148, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a license or state identification card to include a person's full legal name, date of birth, gender designation, residence address, and license number. Specifies gender designation options of F, M, or X. Effective 7/1/2020. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gender Identification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 148, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
2019-07-01HouseAct 148, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880).
2019-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-25HouseThe House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Nakamura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Nakamura, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 831) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-21SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to TRS, JDC.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to PSM/TRS, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 449).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB429 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback