HI HB118 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a grace period for general excise tax payments and broadens certain requirements for consolidated, year-end general excise tax payments.
Title
General Excise Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=118 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB118_.HTM |