HI HB118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the requirement that the state auditor conduct an annual review of certain rapid transit authorities in the State. Provides the auditor with specific direction and scope to complete the audit authorized by Act 1, SSLH 2017. Appropriates funds for the auditor to complete an audit of the Honolulu authority for rapid transportation. Requires the comptroller to withhold vendor contracts reimbursement until the auditor has received all documents that pertain to the reimbursement request. Repeals appointment of two non-voting ex-officio members to the board of directors of the county's rapid transportation authority authorized by Act 1, SSLH 2017. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Inouye, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 697) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReported from GVO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1875) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateRe-Referred to GVO/WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe recommendation was not adopted.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 336).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-05HouseFloor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Luke). Excused, 0 (none).
2019-03-05HouseFloor Amendment No. 3 offered by Rep. Ward.
2019-03-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2).
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback