HI HB1275 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a grant to the 4 Ag Hawaii nonprofit corporation to expand its "Buy Local, It Matters" campaign. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1275 HD1)
Title
Agriculture; 4 Ag Hawaii; Buy Local, It Matters; Grant-in-Aid
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1143 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.