HI HB13 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For time share plans that use title-holding trusts, requires the developer to submit a title report evidencing that the title vested in the trustee. For time share plans that use a notice of time share plan, requires the recordation of the notice and its submission. For time share plans that use alternative arrangements, requires the recordation of any alternative arrangement documents. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Time Sharing Plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB799 (Same As)
HB13 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
HB13 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=13&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB13_HD1_.HTM |