HI HB1324 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the conference center revolving fund within the University of Hawaii at Manoa instead of within the college of continuing education and community service at the University of Hawaii at Manoa. Provides flexibility in the use of the revolving funds.
Title
University of Hawaii; Conference Center Revolving Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB241 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1324 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1324_.HTM |