HI HB1360 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds for relocation of the Clear Channel antenna, including design and construction, equipment and appurtenances, and ground and site improvements. (SD1)
Title
Transportation; Harbors; Antenna ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Harimoto, Kouchi Co-Chairs. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Har, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1497) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRA, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.