HI HB1360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the range of manufactured medical marijuana products that may be produced and sold to include certain edible products. Authorizes eight companies to partner with medical marijuana dispensaries to produce manufactured marijuana products, subject to certain conditions. Establishes requirements for manufacturing, handling, and packaging manufactured marijuana products.
Title
Relating To Manufactured Marijuana Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 19 |
2017-02-09 | House | Re-referred to HLT/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1360 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1149 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB1149 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1360&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1360_.HTM |