HI HB1375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1375
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a homeless care residence program to provide financial assistance to households providing temporary housing and care to a homeless relative. Requires that providers undergo certification and inspection by the department of human services and caps program participation at twelve months. Offers non-refundable income tax credit for providers.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-03-17 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1375 (Carry Over) 2017-02-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-03-17 9:00AM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1375&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1375_.HTM |