HI HB1379 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents the use of DAG and DANC pleas in cases regarding negligent homicide in the third degree. Requires mandatory minimum sentence. Requires license revocation for a minimum of 5 years and a maximum of 10 years if driver is found to have committed 5 or more traffic infractions within the preceding 5-year period.
Title
Negligent Homicide; Criminal Procedure; License Revocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1379 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1379_.HTM |