HI HB1382 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of jet skis at any speed above thirty miles per hour, except under certain conditions.
Title
Thrill Craft; Jet Skis; Speed Limit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |