HI HB1383 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the limit on the number of board members allowed to have private discussions regarding the selection of the board's officers.
Title
Relating To The Sunshine Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB1383 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1383 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1383&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1383_.HTM |