HI HB1388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to implement traffic congestion reduction plans, a statewide traffic flow improvement plan, a statewide infrastructure maintenance and improvement program, and a traffic safety enhancement plan. Requires partnering with academia. Requires annual reports. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
Transportation; Traffic Congestion Reduction
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1388 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1388_.HTM |