HI HB139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Act 072, 05/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Act 072, 05/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Anaergia Inc., with the development of facilities for renewable non-fossil fuel production on Maui. (SD2)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Renewable Energy; Anaergia Inc. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Act 072, 05/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172). |
2015-06-01 | House | Act 072, on 05/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 679). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 654). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Ihara, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 509) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 147). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |