HI HB141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 146, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 146, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes class A and B felonies for labor trafficking offenses, a nonpayment of wages offense, and an unlawful conduct with respect to documents offense. Establishes provisions related to prosecution of the offenses. Requires the Attorney General to report on labor trafficking provisions. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB141 CD1)
Title
Hawaii Penal Code; Labor Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | (H) Act 146, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). | |
2011-06-21 | (S) Act 146, 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Souki. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 3:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ito, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, LAB, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 52). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McKelvey, Pine voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 302. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |