HI HB1413 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a program coordinator and technical support staff member to complete the necessary planning required for an international flight training center and associated aeronautical training programs at Honolulu community college.
Title
Honolulu Community College; Aeronautical Training Program; International Flight Training Center; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1413&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1413_.HTM |