HI HB1416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the farm-to-school program in the department of education to increase the procurement of locally-grown fruits and vegetables. Establishes the Hawaii-grown fresh fruit and vegetable program to increase schoolchildren's access to Hawaii produce. Establishes the farmers to food banks program.
Title
Hawaii Grown Produce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EDN, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1416&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1416_.HTM |