HI HB1417 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency to develop a post-disaster fresh drinking water security plan. Makes an appropriation. Requires a report to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2018. (HB1417 HD1)
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 68). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-02-17 11:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to PBS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1417 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.